THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:08:25 PM
Vakili, Maryam
CPSO#:
87178
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall community hospital
Department of Radiology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: 613-938-4240 Ext. 3362
Fax: 613-938-5374
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Cornwall General Hospital |
Cornwall |
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital |
Alexandria |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYAM VAKILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2010 to 23 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2011 to 03 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |