skip to content

Vajid, Muhammad Ali

CPSO#: 87442

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Sind Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Dept of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Vajid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vajid ( CPSO# 87442 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (647) 449-9110

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Nov 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Jul 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active
 Dr.  Muhammad  Ali  Vajid  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine.