THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:12:10 PM
Vajid, Muhammad Ali
CPSO#:
87442
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Sind Medical College, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Dept of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Nov 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 08 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 10 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
|
Active |