skip to content

Ujaimi, Reem Khaled Abed

CPSO#: 90719

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2009 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2011 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016