THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:28:02 PM
Ujaimi, Reem Khaled Abed
CPSO#:
90719
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2009 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2011 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2016 |