skip to content

Tyler, Kevin Michael

CPSO#: 88644

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St.
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. M. Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tyler ( CPSO# 88644 )
Dr. M. Tyler ( CPSO# 89038 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Business Address:
102 - 135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6V 5Y2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2409

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN MICHAEL TYLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2014