skip to content

Tyler, Melissa Joan

CPSO#: 89038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
111-100 Strowger Blvd
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone: (613) 345-0918
Fax: (613) 345-0865 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St.
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613)345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. M. Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2021
Corporation Name: M. J. Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA JOAN TYLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 09 Feb 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2011