skip to content

Tselios, Konstantinos

CPSO#: 104321

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Division of Rheumatology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L7 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Practice Address Not Available
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 11 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021 Active
 1. Dr. KONSTANTINOS TSELIOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Rheumatology, McMaster University, in which Dr. TSELIOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TSELIOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TSELIOS's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TSELIOS's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 January, 2021, and expires on 30 June, 2023. Upon renewal of Dr. TSELIOS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.