THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:56:34 PM
Tselios, Konstantinos
CPSO#:
104321
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Division of Rheumatology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L7
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jan 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |