skip to content

Treloar, Murray Edward

CPSO#: 31297

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
19 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7426 Beech Hill Rd
Port Hope ON  L1A 3V5 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Treloar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Treloar ( CPSO# 31297 )

Business Address:
7426 Beech Hill Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3V5
Phone Number: (905) 926-1002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 May 2021