THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:23:30 PM
Treloar, Murray Edward
CPSO#:
31297
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
19 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7426 Beech Hill Rd
Port Hope ON L1A 3V5
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Treloar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:20 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 May 2021 |