skip to content

Traill, Larisa May

CPSO#: 94672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MidMichigan Medical Center
300 E. Warwick Drive
Alma MI  48801
United States
Phone: 989-463-1101

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2012 Active
             Dr. Larisa May Traill may practice medicine independently in emergency
            medicine, only.