THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:35:39 AM
Traill, Larisa May
CPSO#:
94672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MidMichigan Medical Center
300 E. Warwick Drive
Alma MI 48801
United States
Phone: 989-463-1101
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Jul 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jul 2012 |
|
Active |