skip to content

Tomes, Ladislav

CPSO#: 87822

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Masaryk University in Brno, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4E 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 2034 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Tomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LADISLAV TOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
EL - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008