THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:39:47 AM
Tomes, Ladislav
CPSO#:
87822
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Masaryk University in Brno, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4E 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 2034
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L. Tomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2013
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LADISLAV TOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
EL - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |