skip to content

Thottungal, James Jacob

CPSO#: 87709

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Dec 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College, Cork, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 13 Sep 2007 to 05 Dec 2007
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 06 Dec 2007 to 13 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2008 to 13 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2009 to 13 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2010 to 13 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2011 to 13 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2012