THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:26:46 AM
Thottungal, James Jacob
CPSO#:
87709
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
13 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University College, Cork, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 13 Sep 2007 to 05 Dec 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 06 Dec 2007 to 13 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2008 to 13 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2009 to 13 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2010 to 13 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2011 to 13 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Oct 2012 |