skip to content

Thamilvaanan, Paramanathan

CPSO#: 97510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education: Medical Academy of Latvia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 973-4401 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Thamilvaanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thamilvaanan ( CPSO# 97510 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARAMANATHAN THAMILVAANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAMILVAANAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 23, 2020, Dr Thamilvaanan has completed all elements of this SCERP

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)