skip to content

Thamilvaanan, Paramanathan

CPSO#: 97510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Medical Academy of Latvia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 973-4401 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Thamilvaanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thamilvaanan ( CPSO# 97510 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 23 Jun 2020 Active
             As from June 23, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paramanathan
            Thamilvaanan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Thamilvaanan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                  
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. PARAMANATHAN THAMILVAANAN
                                          ("Dr. Thamilvaanan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, certificate of registration number 97510, am a
                  member of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that following a public complaint that
                  raised concerns about my care of a patient in my emergency medicine
                  practice, I underwent remediation and a reassessment of my practice. The
                  reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to
                  raise concerns about my practice.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        at least six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessor
                        dated September 2, 2019, January 14, 2020, and February 4, 2020,
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  (e)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review, reflection, a written summary, and discussion with my
                              Clinical Supervisor of Chapter 3: Assessment and
                              Hospitalization Under the Mental Health Act of A Practical
                              Guide to Mental Health and the Law in Ontario, Ontario
                              Hospital Association; 
                  
                        (ii)  Review, reflection and a discussion with my Clinical
                              Supervisor of CPSO's Medical Records Documentation policy;
                  
                        (iii) CMPA's Documentation: Charting Medical Records and
                              Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record keeping
                              eLearning Modules; and
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to provide proof to the College of
                        my successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to complete this requirement within
                        three (3) months.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion
                        of the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the
                        College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location at which I practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any
                        Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
                        Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Thamilvaanan underwent remediation and submitted to a
                              reassessment of his practice following a College
                              investigation. The reassessment report subsequently received
                              by the College continued to raise concerns about his
                              practice. As a result:
                  
                              Dr. Thamilvaanan will practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Thamilvaanan will engage in professional education in
                              psychiatric assessment and hospitalization, and medical
                              record-keeping.
                  
                              Dr. Thamilvaanan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to any person who requires this
                  information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led
                  to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 23, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Paramanathan Thamilvaanan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 23, 2020:

Dr. Thamilvaanan underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice following a College investigation. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College continued to raise concerns about his practice. As a result:

Dr. Thamilvaanan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Thamilvaanan will engage in professional education in psychiatric assessment and hospitalization, and medical record-keeping.

Dr. Thamilvaanan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 23, 2020, Dr Thamilvaanan has completed all elements of this SCERP

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)