skip to content

Tam, Penny Kar-Bo

CPSO#: 85979

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
EL - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2010 to 25 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2011