THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:24:31 AM
Tam, Penny Kar-Bo
CPSO#:
85979
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
25 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2010 to 25 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Feb 2011 |