skip to content

Takahashi, Sachiko

CPSO#: 100612

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Neurology
Room B7 005
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 19522 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SACHIKO TAKAHASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKAHASHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2019