THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:23:11 AM
Takahashi, Sachiko
CPSO#:
100612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 0W7
Phone: 226-213-7171
Fax: 519-933-4458
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 27, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
By letters dated January 17 and 26, 2022, London Health Sciences Centre notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Takahashi’s hospital privileges at both London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph’s Health Care London were suspended effective October 22, 2021 for failure to comply with hospital policy.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SACHIKO TAKAHASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKAHASHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2019 |