skip to content

Takahashi, Paul Kenzie

CPSO#: 20458

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Mar 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Mar 1983

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Jun 1978
Summary:

 In June 1978, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Takahashi guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 26(3); in that he charged a fee 
 that was excessive in relation to the services performed, contrary to s. 26(8); in that he 
 contravened while engaged in the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, 
 regulation or rule or a by-law of a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 
 26(19); in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or 
 certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or 
 treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 26(26); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Takahashi's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 03 May 1979
Hearing Date(s): 30 May 1978


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Mar 1978
Summary:

 In March 1978, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Takahashi guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 26(3); and in that he contravened 
 while engaged in the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or 
 rule or a by-law of a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 26(19).  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Takahashi's licence to practice be suspended for a 
 period of eleven months.  The Committee further ruled that application for termination of this 
 suspension prior to the expiry date would be viewed sympathetically, provided (1) that Dr. 
 Takahashi furnish satisfactory evidence to the College that he had completed all outstanding claim 
 cards as required by the Health Insurance Act, unless specifically requested by patients in 
 writing not to do so; (2) that he provide the College with a signed undertaking to continue to 
 complete all necessary claim forms under the Health Insurance Act relating to his services to 
 patients; and (3) that he provide satisfactory evidence to the College that he was maintaining 
 proper medical records on his patients.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 03 May 1979
Hearing Date(s): 13 Mar 1978