THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:03:04 AM
Takahashi, Paul Kenzie
CPSO#:
20458
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Mar 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Nov 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Mar 1983 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Jun 1978
Summary:
In June 1978, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Takahashi guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 26(3); in that he charged a fee that was excessive in relation to the services performed, contrary to s. 26(8); in that he contravened while engaged in the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or rule or a by-law of a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 26(19); in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him, contrary to s. 26(26); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Takahashi's licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 1979-05-03
Hearing Date(s): 30 May 1978
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Mar 1978
Summary:
In March 1978, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Takahashi guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 26(3); and in that he contravened while engaged in the practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or rule or a by-law of a hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 26(19). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Takahashi's licence to practice be suspended for a period of eleven months. The Committee further ruled that application for termination of this suspension prior to the expiry date would be viewed sympathetically, provided (1) that Dr. Takahashi furnish satisfactory evidence to the College that he had completed all outstanding claim cards as required by the Health Insurance Act, unless specifically requested by patients in writing not to do so; (2) that he provide the College with a signed undertaking to continue to complete all necessary claim forms under the Health Insurance Act relating to his services to patients; and (3) that he provide satisfactory evidence to the College that he was maintaining proper medical records on his patients.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1979-05-03
Hearing Date(s): 13 Mar 1978