skip to content

Tadros, Manal Adly Halim

CPSO#: 89160

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-1500 Ext. 205992 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Manal Tadros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tadros ( CPSO# 89160 )

Business Address:
Alpha Laboratories
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Phone Number: (416) 725-2045

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANAL ADLY HALIM TADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2015