THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:50:40 PM
Tadros, Manal Adly Halim
CPSO#:
89160
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-1500 Ext. 205992
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANAL ADLY HALIM TADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2015 |