skip to content

Taabazuing, Mary-Margaret

CPSO#: 85612

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON, N6A 5W9
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 57032
Fax: 5196858813 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Taabazuing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taabazuing ( CPSO# 85612 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:12 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY-MARGARET TAABAZUING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAABAZUING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009