THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:10:57 AM
Taabazuing, Mary-Margaret
CPSO#:
85612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON, N6A 5W9
London ON N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 57032
Fax: 5196858813
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:12 May 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY-MARGARET TAABAZUING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAABAZUING is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |