skip to content

Syed, Nazia Hussain

CPSO#: 87415

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department Of Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nazia H. Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Syed ( CPSO# 87415 )

Business Address:
Tower Hill Medical Centre
17 - 380 Tower Hill Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0T8
Phone Number: (289) 475-6104

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAZIA HUSSAIN SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011