THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:39:48 PM
Syed, Nazia Hussain
CPSO#:
87415
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department Of Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAZIA HUSSAIN SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |