skip to content

Sundaram, Arun N E

CPSO#: 86530

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
M1 202C; M wing, First floor
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4808
Fax: (416) 480-4481 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Division of Neurology
A 233
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. Ext. 89124
Fax: (416) 480-4833
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARUN N E SUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008