THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:58:10 PM
Sundaram, Arun N E
CPSO#:
86530
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Mysore University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
M1 202B; M wing, First floor
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4808
Fax: (416) 480-7876
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:29 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARUN N E SUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDARAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2008 |