skip to content

Sukhera, Javeed Iqbal

CPSO#: 98627

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Apr 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Zone B Room B8-176
800 Commissioners Road E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 74968
Fax: (519) 667-6514 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Javeed Sukhera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sukhera ( CPSO# 98627 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Suite B8-176
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015 Active
             Dr. Javeed Iqbal Sukhera may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.