THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 12:27:47 PM
Sukhera, Javeed Iqbal
CPSO#:
98627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
871 Trafalgar St
Vanier Children's Service
London ON N5Z 1E6
Phone: 519-433-3101
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Javeed Sukhera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 25 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Connecticut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2015 |
|
Active |