skip to content

Stutz, Eric Michael

CPSO#: 86686

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 410
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 285-3323
Fax: (416) 285-1825 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nadel and Stutz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stutz ( CPSO# 86686 )
Dr. O. Nadel ( CPSO# 86802 )

Business Address:
410 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 285-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC MICHAEL STUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STUTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 03 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009