THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:11:44 AM
Stutz, Eric Michael
CPSO#:
86686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 410
Toronto ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 285-3323
Fax: (416) 285-1825
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Sep 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC MICHAEL STUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STUTZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 03 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |