skip to content

Stuart, Philip Frazer

CPSO#: 24055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-4640 Jane St
North York ON  M3N 2K5
Phone: 416 447 3324
Fax: 416 447 3324 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip F. Stuart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stuart ( CPSO# 24055 )

Business Address:
B1
4640 Jane Street
North York ON  M3N 2K5
Phone Number: (416) 447-3324

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP FRAZER STUART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STUART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1970

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 10, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Frazer Stuart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2022:

Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Stuart’s record-keeping and compliance with age-related screens in his family practice. As Dr. Stuart was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Stuart agreeing to resign from the College effective May 31, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)