THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:07:16 AM
Stuart, Philip Frazer
CPSO#:
24055
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Philip F. Stuart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 10, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Frazer Stuart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 10, 2022:
Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Stuart’s record-keeping and compliance with age-related screens in his family practice. As Dr. Stuart was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Stuart agreeing to resign from the College effective May 31, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)