skip to content

Stoica, John

CPSO#: 29661

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Stoicoviciu, Mircea Ion Romulus (used until: 29 Sep 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian, Italian, Romanian

Education:Regele Ferdinand I University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2009
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.