THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:24:29 PM
Stoica, John
CPSO#:
29661
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Oct 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Stoicoviciu, Mircea Ion Romulus (used until: 29 Sep 1983 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Hungarian, Italian, Romanian
Education: Regele Ferdinand I University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Dec 2009 |