skip to content

Stevens, Donald George Hart

CPSO#: 19178

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Aug 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 87 Peevers Crescent Newmarket ON L3Y 7T2
Date Received: 08 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2016