THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:00:23 PM
Stevens, Donald George Hart
CPSO#:
19178
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
08 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
87 Peevers Crescent
Newmarket ON L3Y 7T2
Date Received: 08 Jul 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1964 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jul 2016 |