skip to content

Stefanac, Mile

CPSO#: 85728

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memoria Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905 873 0111 Ext. 8505
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stefanac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stefanac ( CPSO# 85728 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILE STEFANAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 22 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2008