THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 2:32:19 AM
Stefanac, Mile
CPSO#:
85728
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memoria Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MILE STEFANAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANAC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 22 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2008 |