skip to content

St. Pierre, Taunya St. Pierre Medicine Professional Corp Taunya

CPSO#: 86375

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sports Medicine Centre
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1565 Maple Grover Road
Kanata ON  K2V 1A3
Phone: (613) 591-3939 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Costello Drive
Carleton Place ON  K7C 0A5
Canada
Phone: 613-253-2112
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613-256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Taunya St. Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. St. Pierre ( CPSO# 86375 )

Business Address:
Sports Medicine Centre
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1565 Maple Grove Road
Kanata ON  K2V 1A3
Phone Number: (613) 591-3939

Business Address:
2 Costello Drive
Carleton Place ON  K7C 0C3
Phone Number: (613) 253-2112

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
74 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:08 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAUNYA ST. PIERRE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORP TAUNYA ST. PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 04 Jun 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 04 May 2009 to 29 May 2009
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2012