THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:59:15 PM
St. Pierre, Taunya
CPSO#:
86375
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1565 Maple Grove Rd
Kanata ON K2V 1A3
Phone: 613-801-0166
Fax: 613-801-0167
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:08 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAUNYA ST. PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. PIERRE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 04 Jun 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 04 May 2009 to 29 May 2009
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2012 |