skip to content

Somogyi, Ron Barry

CPSO#: 88860

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Plastic Surgery
Suite 410
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-6336
Fax: (416) 323-6325 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

162 Cumberland Street West
Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R3N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 316
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C1J4
Canada
Phone: 4164476176
Fax: 4164475750
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ron B. Somogyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Somogyi ( CPSO# 88860 )

Business Address:
Toronto Plastic Surgery
Suite 410
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-6336

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5


Corporation Name: Ron Barry Somogyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Somogyi ( CPSO# 88860 )

Business Address:
Toronto Plastic Surgery
410-790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-6336

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
225-162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RON BARRY SOMOGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMOGYI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014