THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 13:08:40 PM
Somogyi, Ron Barry
CPSO#:
88860
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
FORM Face + Body
Suite 316
20 Wynford Dr
Toronto ON M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 447-6176
Fax: (416) 447-5750
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RON BARRY SOMOGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMOGYI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2014 |