skip to content

Solomon, Robert Scott

CPSO#: 61179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
474 College street unit B-3
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone: 416 921 0880
Fax: 416 921 0088 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maple Telemedicine
355 Adelaide St W
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5V 0A8
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Quebec
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT SCOTT SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007